IL SB1982 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that of the federal funds received by the State for purposes related to the COVID-19 public health emergency, 25% of any such funds shall be allocated as grants to businesses with less than 50 employees. Provides eligibility requirements for businesses seeking to receive such grants. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall award grants in the amount of $5,000 to eligible businesses. Provides that a business shall only be eligible for one such grant. Requires the Department to publish the names of the businesses that are awarded grants on its Internet website. Provides for the adoption of rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-CORONAVIRUS RELIEF

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2021-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Appropriations- Revenue and Finance
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-04-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2021-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-03-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2021-03-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-03-16SenateTo Appropriations- Revenue and Finance
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Appropriations
2021-03-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1055New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback