IL SB1981 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governor's Office of Management and Budget Act. Provides that the annual economic and fiscal policy report must include a projection of fund balances for each fund held in the State treasury, outlining for each fund revenues, expenditures, and the estimated end of year fund balance for the current fiscal year, the upcoming fiscal year, and the 4 previous years. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOMB-FUND BALANCES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; McConchie
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McConchie
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-03-13SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030057.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback