IL SB1979 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption, provides that in all counties (now, in counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants), the county board may by resolution provide that if a person has been granted a senior citizens homestead exemption, the person qualifying need not reapply for the exemption. Provides that the county recorder of deeds shall alert the assessor whenever the transfer of ownership of any property receiving a Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption has occurred. Provides that, if such a transfer occurs, the assessor shall remove the exemption and provide the new property owner with information concerning reapplication. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1104 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2018 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-14 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |