IL SB1978 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Home Care Consumer and Worker Protection Act. Provides that an individual performing services for a private home care provider (a home services agency, home nursing agency, or internet-based business that arranges for home care services) is presumed to be an employee unless specified conditions exist; however, a sole proprietor or partnership performing services is not considered an employee of the agency or private party upon a showing that it is a legitimate subcontractor. Makes it a violation of the Act for a private home care provider not to designate an individual as an employee unless the private home care provider complies with specified provisions. Provides that an interested party may file a complaint online through the website of the Department of Labor against a private home care provider if there is a reasonable belief that the employer is in violation of the Act. Provides that the Department shall enforce the Act and may conduct investigations, obtain documentation, and subpoena books, records, and witnesses to conduct its investigations. Prohibits discharge or other retaliation for exercising rights under the Act. Contains provisions concerning violations, penalties, private rights of action, referrals, rulemaking, and other matters. Provides that moneys received by the Department under the Act shall be deposited into the Home Care Consumer and Worker Protection Fund and amends the State Finance Act to include it as a special fund in the State treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOME CARE PROTECTION ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-07-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 047-000-000
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Labor; 013-000-000
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Labor
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - June 30, 2017
2017-06-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-06-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-06-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-06-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 029-000-000
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-009-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 010-006-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-03-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-004-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1978&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1978.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1978eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1978enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1978sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1978ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1978ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1978_04272017_076000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1978_06292017_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1978_07012017_009000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback