IL SB1975 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Historical Library Act. Provides that selected past editions of newspapers of this State that are preserved under a program within the Lincoln Presidential Library shall be preserved in accordance with industry standards (rather than being microphotographed). Provides that, upon payment of the required fee, any person or organization shall be granted access to the preserved edition (rather than being supplied with prints requested to be made from the negatives of the microphotographs). Provides that the required fee shall be determined by the State Historian and shall be equal to the cost incurred by the Lincoln Presidential Library in granting such access (rather than the cost of supplying the prints). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LINCOLN PRES LIBRARY-NEWSPAPER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2034255.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback