IL SB1972 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Healthy Workplace Act and amends the State Finance Act. Requires employers to provide specified paid sick days to employees. Sets forth the purposes for and manner in which the sick days may be used. Contains provisions regarding employer responsibilities, unlawful employer practices, and other matters. Provides that an employee who works in the State who is absent from work for specified reasons is entitled to earn and use a minimum of 40 hours of paid sick time during a 12-month period or a pro rata number of hours of paid sick time under the provisions of the Act. Provides that it is unlawful for an employer to interfere with, restrain, deny, change work days or hours scheduled to avoid paying sick time, or discipline an employee for the exercise of, or the attempt to exercise, any right provided under or in connection with the Act, including considering the use of paid sick time as a negative factor in an employment action that involves hiring, terminating, evaluating, promoting, disciplining, or counting the paid sick time under a no-fault attendance policy. Provides that any employer that the Department of Labor or a court finds by a preponderance of the evidence to have knowingly, repeatedly, or with reckless disregard violated any provision of the Act or any rule adopted under the Act is subject to a civil money penalty to be paid to the employee not to exceed $2,500 for each separate offense. Provides that the Department of Labor shall administer the Act. Authorizes individuals to file civil actions with respect to violations. Creates the Healthy Workplace Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTHY WORKPLACE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Labor
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback