IL SB1970 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Confidentiality Act. Provides for the limited disclosure of protected mental health information of a recipient who is an inpatient of a mental health facility related to an individual's involvement with the recipient's mental health care or payment related to the recipient's mental health care. Provides eligibility factors for an individual seeking the disclosure of the information. Provides that whenever the disclosure of information is made without consent, the recipient shall be provided with written disclosure and afforded an opportunity to designate an agent or an attorney-in-fact, and documentation of the disclosure or use shall be noted in the recipient's record. Provides that once the recipient regains the capacity for informed consent, the provisions no longer apply and any allowance for the exchange of information between individuals and the medical personnel is terminated. Restricts an individual who receives information from redisclosing the information except under limited circumstances. Provides that any person who knowingly and willfully violates the provisions is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that nothing in the new provisions shall be interpreted to allow a disclosure that is otherwise prohibited under any other State law or any federal law concerning informed consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACCESS TO MENTAL HEALTH INFO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0372
2021-08-13SenateEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-08-13SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 009-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
2021-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 30, 2021
2021-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2021-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 014-000-000
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 016-000-000
2021-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-05-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-04-23HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4 (a)
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-005-000
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Fine
2021-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Behavioral and Mental Health; 009-001-000
2021-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health
2021-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 011-000-000
2021-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Behavioral and Mental Health
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1970&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1970.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1970eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1970enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/102/102-0372.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1970sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1970sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1970ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1970ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1970ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1970_04222021_061000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB1970_05292021_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1970ham003_05302021_070000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback