IL SB1970 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Financial Transaction Tax Act. Imposes a tax on the privilege of engaging in a financial transaction that occurs, is effectuated, consummated, executed, or cleared at a facility located in the State. Provides that the tax is imposed at a rate of $1 per contract for all transactions for which the underlying asset is an agricultural product and $2 per contract for all other contracts. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCIAL TRANSACTION TAX
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1970&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1970.htm |