IL SB1966 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Interstate Contracts for Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Treatment Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to enable Illinois and Wisconsin residents who are subject, by court order, to involuntary admission on an inpatient basis for the treatment of a mental health or substance use disorder to obtain appropriate treatment across state lines in qualified hospitals and facilities that are closer to their homes than are facilities available in their home states. Permits mental health facilities located in certain northern border counties to contract with Wisconsin county departments to provide substance use or mental health treatment to Wisconsin residents who are subject to involuntary commitment orders for treatment issued by Wisconsin courts, except that no services may be provided to Wisconsin residents who are involved in a criminal proceeding. Permits mental health facilities located in certain northern border counties to contract with Wisconsin county departments to secure substance use or mental health treatment for Illinois residents who are subject to involuntary commitment orders for treatment issued by State courts, except that no services may be secured for Illinois residents who are committed under specified provisions of the Code of Criminal Procedure or the Unified Code of Corrections. Contains provisions concerning involuntary commitment court orders, treatment records, transfers between facilities, required contract provisions, and other matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MENTAL HLTH-OUT-OF-STATE CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0371
2021-08-13SenateEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-08-13SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-17SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 015-000-000
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Johnson
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
2021-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Behavioral and Mental Health; 011-000-000
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
2021-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health
2021-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 011-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Behavioral and Mental Health
2021-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2021-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback