IL SB1965 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that Juneteenth National Freedom Day shall be observed on June 19 of each year as a holiday throughout the State (currently, not a holiday and is observed on the third Saturday of June of each year). Provides that when June 19 falls on a Sunday, the following Monday shall be held and considered the holiday. Amends the Election Code, the Illinois Procurement Code, the School Code, and the Promissory Note and Bank Holiday Act to include Juneteenth National Freedom Day as a holiday. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE HOLIDAY-JUNETEENTH

Sponsors

Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D]Sen. Christopher Belt [D]Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D]Sen. Adriane Johnson [D]
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D]Sen. Mike Simmons [D]Sen. Robert Peters [D]Sen. Karina Villa [D]
Sen. Laura Murphy [D]Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D]Sen. Celina Villanueva [D]Sen. John Connor [D]
Sen. Michael Hastings [D]Sen. Cristina Castro [D]Sen. Elgie Sims [D]Sen. Laura Fine [D]
Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D]Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D]Sen. Patricia Vanpelt-Watkins [D]Sen. Doris Turner [D]
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D]Rep. Timothy Butler [R]Rep. Camille Lilly [D]
Rep. Mark Batinick [R]Rep. Lamont Robinson [D]Rep. Kambium Buckner [D]Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]
Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D]Rep. Robert Rita [D]Rep. Kelly Burke [D]Rep. Bob Morgan [D]
Rep. Aaron Ortiz [D]Rep. Theresa Mah [D]Rep. Eva Dina Delgado [D]Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]
Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Paul Jacobs [R]Rep. Michael Marron [R]Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R]
Rep. Sue Scherer [D]Rep. Joyce Mason [D]Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]Rep. Lance Yednock [D]
Rep. Michael Halpin [D]Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D]Rep. Ann Williams [D]Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback [D]
Rep. Lakesia Collins [D]Rep. Maurice West [D]Rep. Delia Ramirez [D]Rep. Chris Bos [R]
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D]Rep. Cyril Nichols [D]Rep. Carol Ammons [D]Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D]
Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mark Walker [D]Rep. Anna Moeller [D]
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D]Rep. Dagmara Avelar [D]Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateSent to the Governor
2021-06-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2021-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-05-27HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-05-27HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-05-27HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2021-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-18HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady
2021-05-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2021-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-05-14HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tim Butler
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-04-23HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-03-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 015-000-000
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-03-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-6Amended CodeCitation Text
105524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
20563017Amended CodeCitation Text
3050015-45Amended CodeCitation Text
549063Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback