IL SB1965 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Provides that an individual otherwise qualified for and intending to apply for a direct care position who has a disqualifying conviction may initiate a fingerprint-based criminal history record check where a conditional offer of employment has not been made and such a background check has not been previously conducted, and allows those individuals to request a waiver of the prohibition of employment. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH CARE WORKER BACKGROUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0176 |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Effective Date July 31, 2019 |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-035-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Public Health |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 46 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |