IL SB1960 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Provides that a municipality or park district may authorize and regulate the operation of low-speed electric scooters within the unit of local government on any or all highways, sidewalks, trails, or other public right of way where the operation of bicycles are permitted (rather than a person may operate a low-speed electric scooter where the operation of bicycles are permitted, including, but not limited to, bicycle lanes and bicycle paths, and shall have all of the rights and shall be subject to all of the duties applicable to the rider of a bicycle under the Code, except in specified situations). Provides that the use of low-speed electric scooters within any municipality or park district is allowed only if authorized by the municipality or park district. Provides that an authorization or regulation by a county or park district shall apply only in the unincorporated area of that county or on park district property. Provides that a person may not operate a low-speed electric scooter on a highway with a posted speed limit in excess of 35 mph (rather than a person may not operate a low-speed electric scooter without a driver's license, instruction permit, or State identification card). Provides that a person may not operate a low-speed electric scooter unless he or she is 16 (rather than 18) years of age or older. Provides that a person may not operate a low-speed electric scooter while carrying any package, bundle, or article that prevents the operator from keeping at least one hand upon the handlebars. Removes provisions of the Code concerning vehicles and motor vehicles. Removes language providing that an entity may not operate a low-speed electric scooter business within a municipality unless the municipality authorizes the operation of low-speed electric scooters within the municipal limits. Adds provisions relating to use of low-speed electric scooters, low-speed electric scooters in rights-of-way, and operation of low-speed electric scooters under the influence of alcohol or any drug. Exempts low-speed electric scooters from title, registration, and driver's licenses requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-ELECTRIC SCOOTERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-005-000 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Koehler |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Transportation |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-140.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 1-217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1518 | New Code | See Bill Text |