IL SB1957 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that on or before August 31, 2020, and on or before August 31 of the next 9 fiscal years thereafter, the Comptroller shall transfer from the General Revenue Fund to the Justice Reinvestment Fund 85% of the total savings calculated by the Sentencing Policy Advisory Council from costs savings from criminal justice reforms enacted into law. Provides that the Fund shall be jointly administered by the Department of Human Services and the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority, and each county shall be entitled to a proportionate share of the annual funds available from the Justice Reinvestment Fund provided it meets certain criteria. Provides that funds left unclaimed due to a qualifying county failing to submit an application or meet the specified criteria shall be reallocated to the counties that, based on the determination of the Department of Human Services and the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority, have been most effective in using their funds to improve public health and safety. Provides that counties receiving funds shall submit an annual report to the Department of Human Services and the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority detailing the uses of the funds and the impact they have had on public health and safety. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes. Makes other changes.
Title
JUSTICE REINVESTMENT FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-003-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1957&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1957.htm |