IL SB1948 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision of the State Universities Article that requires an employer to make an additional contribution to the System for certain salary increases greater than 3%, excludes salary increases resulting from overload work or a promotion if certain requirements are met. In a provision of the Downstate Teachers Article that requires an employer to make an additional contribution to the System for certain salary increases greater than 3%, excludes payments made to an individual who holds a professional educator license endorsed for any area of career and technical education or an educator license with stipulations endorsed for any area of career and technical education and excludes salary increases resulting from overload work or a promotion if certain requirements are met or resulting from duties as a coach or advisor for an extracurricular activity. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1948&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1948.htm |