IL SB1945 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Public Community College Act. With respect to school boards of school districts and boards of trustees of community college districts, provides that officers are subject to removal by a majority vote of all the board members and, in case of removal or where a vacancy otherwise occurs in any of the offices, the board shall appoint or elect a successor to fill the vacancy. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH BD/COM COL BD-OFFICERS
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |