IL SB1943 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Deletes provisions concerning the Illinois Industrial Materials Exchange throughout the Act. Provides that specified generators of vegetable by-products shall prepare an annual report that must be retained on the premises of the generator for a specified period and be made available to the Agency (currently, specified generators of vegetable by-products are required to file an annual report with the Agency). Removes a provision providing that specified monies in the Used Tire Management Fund may be used to assist with the marketing of used tires. Repeals provisions concerning maximum contaminant levels for barium, fluoride, and radionuclides. Makes other changes. Amends the Environmental Toxicology Act. Deletes provisions concerning the State Remedial Action Priority List throughout the Act. Amends the Illinois Plumbing License Law. Provides that each school district or chief school administrator, or the designee of each school district or chief school administrator, shall arrange to have the samples it collects to test each source of potable water in a school building for lead contamination submitted to a specified laboratory. Provides that, within 7 days after receiving a final analytical result concerning such a sample, the school district or chief school administrator, or a designee of the school district or chief school administrator, that collected the sample shall provide the final analytical result to the Department of Public Health. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-INDUSTR MATERIALS EXCHANGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0103
2017-08-11SenateEffective Date August 11, 2017
2017-08-11SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-16SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-19SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-001-000
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 018-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22532035.5Amended CodeCitation Text
415512.4Amended CodeCitation Text
415517.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
415521Amended CodeCitation Text
415522.15Amended CodeCitation Text
415522.28Amended CodeCitation Text
415522.29Amended CodeCitation Text
415555Amended CodeCitation Text
415555.6Amended CodeCitation Text
415753Amended CodeCitation Text
415755Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback