IL SB1943 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Patient Rights Act. Provides that a hospital must include in its written statement of patients' rights the right not to be discriminated against by the hospital due to the patient's race, color, or national origin where such characteristics are not relevant to the patient's medical diagnosis and treatment, and that the statement should put the patient on notice on how to initiate a grievance with the hospital or with the Illinois Department of Public Health regarding improper discrimination. Sets forth discrimination grievance procedures and provides language all hospitals must post for the benefit of patients regarding the hospital's emergency room anti-discrimination policy. Effective immediately.
Title
MED PATIENT RT-DISCRIMINATION
Sponsors
Sen. William Delgado [D] | Sen. Michael Frerichs [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0612 |
2011-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William Delgado |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William Delgado |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William Delgado |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3, 4 - May 29, 2011 |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3, 4 |
2011-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly du Buclet |
2011-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-19 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-18 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 015-000-000 |
2011-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2011-05-09 | House | Re-assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2011-05-05 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-04-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 50 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 50 | 5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 50 | 5.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |