IL SB1941 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Homeowners' Energy Policy Statement Act. Provides that the Act does not apply to any building that is greater than 30 feet in height and is not a single family residential home (instead of "any building that is greater than 30 feet in height"). Effective immediately.
Title
HOMEOWNERS ENERGY POLICY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 165 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |