IL SB1938 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State, upon payment of $4,600, to release easements of access, crossing, light, air, and view from, to, and over described land in Bond County, subject to certain requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOT-LAND TRANSFER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0361 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |