IL SB1935 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Allows the State Board of Elections to receive voter registration information provided by applicants using electronic voter registration portals (rather than the Board's website). Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, a person who is otherwise qualified to vote may preregister to vote on or after that person's 16th birthday, with the registration held in abeyance by the appropriate election authority until that individual attains the required age to vote. Requires preregistration to be completed using the online voter registration system or an electronic voter registration portal. Provides that for the purposes of the Code, an individual who is 16 years of age or older (rather than who is 17 years of age and who will be 18 years of age on the date of the general or consolidated election) shall be deemed competent to execute and attest to any voter registration forms.
Title
ELEC CD-VOTER REGISTRATION AGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1935&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1935.htm |