IL SB1934 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person licensed as an automotive parts recycler is subject to junk vehicle notification requirements. Provides that an application for licensure as an automotive parts recycler, scrap processor, repairer, or rebuilder will require a National Motor Vehicle Title Information System number and a statement of compliance if applicable. Provides that the Secretary of State shall inspect any vehicle that is 3 (rather than the previous 8) model years of age or newer for which an application for a certificate of title for a rebuilt vehicle is submitted. Provides that the Secretary shall authorize an individual having been consecutively licensed as an automotive parts recycler and a rebuilder for a minimum of 5 years to carry out and implement the inspection of rebuilt vehicles. Provides that no person shall engage in the act of dismantling, crushing, or altering a vehicle into another form using machinery or equipment unless licensed to do so and only from the fixed location identified on the license issued by the Secretary of State. Authorizes Secretary of State police investigators to issue administrative citations to certain entities for, among other things, operating without a license. Effective immediately.
Title
AUTOMOTIVE PARTS RECYCLER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0572 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |