IL SB1933 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Allows the Environmental Protection Agency and the person complained against to agree to an extended time period to (i) submit a written response to the alleged violations and (ii) hold a requested meeting without a representative of the Office of the Attorney General or the State's Attorney of the county in which the alleged violation occurred. Provides that the Agency and the person complained against may agree to a later time period, not to exceed an additional 30 days, in which the person shall either agree to and sign the proposed Compliance Commitment Agreement or notify the Agency of the person's rejection of the proposed Compliance Commitment Agreement. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-COMPLIANCE AGREEMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Environment and Conservation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Re-assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |