IL SB1933 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with this change: changes "concealment" to "conceal". Also changes definition of "conceal", for the purposes of the provision that prohibits the knowing destruction, alteration, concealment, or disguising physical evidence, planting false evidence, or furnishing false information, to hiding evidence in a manner that makes its discovery or recovery materially more difficult or impossible. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-OBSTRUCTING JUSTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 31-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |