IL SB1933 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that unclaimed wages, payroll, and salary in any form, held or owing by a banking or financial organization, is presumed abandoned after one year (instead of 5 years). Provides that unclaimed wages, payroll, and salary in any form shall be reported after remaining unclaimed for one year. Effective immediately.
Title
UNCLAIMED PROP-WAGES-LIMIT
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Rep. Keith Farnham [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. William Delgado |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 009-006-000 |
2011-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Held in Executive |
2011-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-27 | House | Verified |
2011-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Unlimited Debate - Passed 065-048-004 |
2011-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Unlimited Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2011-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2011-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-23 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley |
2011-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-04-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2011-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2011 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 010-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 1025 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1025 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |