IL SB1930 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Traditional Asian Healing Therapist Licensing Act. Provides for the licensure of traditional Asian healing therapist, which specifically includes the practice of Asian bodywork therapy, clinical Qigong therapy, and Thai bodywork therapy, by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Creates the Traditional Asian Healing Therapist Licensing Board. Sets forth provisions concerning application, qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2032. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRADITIONAL ASIAN HEALING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-01-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2022-01-05SenateRe-assigned to Licensed Activities
2021-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2021-03-24SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2021-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback