IL SB1930 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act. Contains provisions concerning jurisdiction over adult guardianships, conservatorships, and other protective proceedings. Sets forth guidelines to specify which court has jurisdiction to appoint a guardian or conservator for an incapacitated adult, by prioritizing the states which might claim jurisdiction. Provides for designation of a "home state" and a "significant-connection state". Provides for communication and cooperation between courts. Contains provisions concerning transfer of guardianship or conservatorship to another state. Provides for registration and recognition of guardianship or protective orders from other states.
Title
UNIFORM ACT-ADULT GUARDIANSHIP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-31 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-29 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-14 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-05-14 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-14 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-05-12 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-05-08 | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |