IL SB1927 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-21 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-21 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall investigate every allegation of abuse or neglect of a patient received by the Department. Provides that no administrator, agent, or employee of a hospital or a member of its medical staff may abuse or neglect a patient in the hospital, and provides that any hospital administrator, agent, employee, or medical staff member who has reasonable cause to believe that any patient with whom he or she has direct contact has been subjected to abuse or neglect in the hospital shall promptly report or cause a report to be made to a designated hospital administrator responsible for providing such reports to the Department of Public Health. Sets forth other provisions concerning protection of hospital patients from abuse and neglect. Provides that if no health care surrogate is available for a patient who lacks decision-making capacity, then the hospital may contact the Guardianship and Advocacy Commission to determine the need for a temporary guardian of the person.
Title
IDPH-HOSPITALS-ABUSE-NEGLECT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-21 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-12-21 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-08 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-10-08 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009 | |
2009-10-07 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |