IL SB1918 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Deletes language providing that 50% of the moneys in the Offender Registration Fund shall be allocated by the Department of State Police for sheriffs' offices and police departments. Effective immediately.
Title
ST POLICE-FUND CONSOLIDATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0571 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-001 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-001 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.462 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.669 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.694 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 154 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 154 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 154 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |