IL SB1917 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Removes the age limitation for coverage in provisions concerning coverage for epinephrine injectors. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CODE–EPINEPHRINE INJECTOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |