IL SB1917 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0729
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0729
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that a notice of penalty sent to a facility must contain a detailed computation showing how the amount of the penalty was derived, including the number of days and the number of residents on which the penalty was based. Effective immediately.
Title
IDPH-NURSING HOME-PENALTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0729 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date August 25, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-05-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-05-29 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 005-000-000 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado |