IL SB1916 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police may appoint investigators to collect and preserve physical evidence, forensic art, forensic mapping, photography, sketches of crime scenes, diagrams and animations of crash and crime scenes, and any other related duties imposed under law administered by the Department. Provides that the Director of State Police may authorize each investigator employed and any other employee of the Department exercising the powers of a peace officer a distinct badge that, on its face that: (1) clearly states that the badge is authorized by the Department; (2) indicates his or her position of crime scene investigator; and (3) contains a unique identifying number. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST POLICE-SCENE INVESTIGATORS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-06-21SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-203New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback