IL SB1915 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1081
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1081
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that when a State agency or institution of higher education contract (rather than only a State contract) is to be awarded to the lowest responsible bidder, an otherwise qualified bidder who will fulfill the contract through the use of compostable foodware or recyclable foodware may be given preference over other bidders unable to do so; provided that the bid is not more than 5% greater than the cost of products that are single-use plastic disposable foodware. Provides that the contract awarded the cost preference shall also include the option of providing the State agency or institution of higher education with single-use plastic straws. Prohibits the procurement and use of single-use plastic disposable foodware at State parks and natural areas (removes the Illinois State Fair from this prohibition). Removes provision specifying that the prohibition does not apply to the procurement of single-use plastic disposable straws if a State agency is servicing medically vulnerable persons. Provides that the prohibition on the use of single-use plastic disposable foodware does not apply to the procurement of supplies for the Illinois State Fair. Makes conforming changes.
Title
PROCUREMENT-SINGLE USE PLASTIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1081 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-044-002 |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-003-000 |
2022-03-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-02-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-013-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Morrison |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-002-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-003-000 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |