IL SB1909 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends Criminal Code of 2012. Defines "servicemember" and "veteran". Provides that a person commits aggravated assault or aggravated battery when he or she commits an assault or a battery against a servicemember or veteran. Provides that an aggravated assault committed against a servicemember or veteran without legal justification is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that an aggravated battery committed against a servicemember or veteran is a Class 3 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-ASSAULT&BATTERY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-24SenateTo Criminal Law- Clear Compliance
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-0.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback