IL SB1907 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that the tax imposed on the privilege of operating motor vehicles that use liquefied natural gas or propane is 21.5 cents per gallon. Provides that the tax imposed on compressed natural gas is 19 cents per gallon. Provides that, in the case of liquefied natural gas and propane, "gallon" means a diesel gallon equivalent. Amends the Weights and Measures Act. Provides that liquefied natural gas used as motor fuel shall be sold in diesel gallon equivalents, and compressed natural gas shall be sold in gasoline gallon equivalents. Provides that propane used as motor fuel shall be sold in actual measured gallon volumetric units, subject to adjustment for the purposes of determining the diesel gallon equivalents that are subject to the tax rates under the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Amends the Environmental Impact Fee Law. Provides that no fee is imposed on the importation or receipt of liquefied natural gas (i) sold to or used by a rail carrier or (ii) consumed or used in the operation of ships, barges, or vessels that are used primarily in or for the transportation of property in interstate commerce for hire on rivers bordering Illinois if the natural gas is delivered to the ship, barge, or vessel by a licensed receiver.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-MEASUREMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-01-03 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-005-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-11 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 470 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 470 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.13C | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 1.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 1.8A | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 1.8B | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 125 | 310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |