IL SB1907 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Requires the State Board of Elections to adopt rules establishing a procedure to send vote by mail ballots via electronic transmission and enable a voter with a disability to independently and privately mark a ballot using assistive technology in order for the voter to vote by mail. Provides that if a request for an accessible vote by mail ballot from a voter with a disability arrives after the election authority begins transmitting vote by mail ballots and instructions to voters, the election authority shall transmit the ballot, instructions, and balloting materials to the voter within 3 business days after receipt of the application. Requires a vote by mail ballot provided to a voter with a disability to be received and marked as required by all vote by mail ballots. Makes corresponding changes throughout the Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-MAIL BALLOT/DISABILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-03-24SenateTo Executive- Elections
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10519-2.4New CodeSee Bill Text
10519-4Amended CodeCitation Text
10519-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10524A-14Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback