IL SB1906 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act to require coverage for hearing instruments and related services for all individuals under the age of 18 when a hearing care professional prescribes a hearing instrument. Provides that an insurer shall provide coverage for hearing aids subject to certain restrictions. Provides that an insurer shall not be required to pay a claim if the insured filed such a claim 12 months prior to the date of filing the claim with the insurer and the claim was paid by any insurer. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD - HEARING AID COVERAGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
21516510Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.25New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback