IL SB1904 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Further amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act by providing that parties to juvenile court proceedings are entitled to receive copies of unfounded reports regarding the same child, a sibling of the child, the same perpetrator, or a child or perpetrator in the same household as the child for purposes of certain types of juvenile court hearings (rather than parties to juvenile court proceedings are entitled to receive copies of unfounded reports regarding the same child, a sibling of the child, or a child or perpetrator in the same household as the child, including a household from which a child was removed or into which a child may be placed, for purposes of certain types of juvenile court hearings). Makes revisions to language in the introduced bill concerning the admissibility of unfounded reports in certain judicial proceedings and hearings. Removes the amendatory changes made to the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 in the introduced bill. Changes the effective date to immediate.
Title
DCFS-JUV CT-ABUSE RPT&PETITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0532 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-27 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-007-003 |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-10 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Health; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported Back To Health; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Children & Family |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 7.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-8.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |