IL SB1903 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Provides that no owner of a companion animal (rather than a cat or dog that is a companion animal) may expose the companion animal in a manner that places that animal in a life-threatening situation for a prolonged period of time in extreme heat or cold conditions that: (1) results in injury to or death of the animal; or (2) results in hypothermia, hyperthermia, frostbite, or similar condition as diagnosed by a doctor of veterinary medicine.
Title
COMPANION ANIMAL-COLD/HEAT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 3.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1903&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1903.htm |