IL SB1900 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Diseased Animals Act. Deletes a provision providing that all rules of the Department of Agriculture, and all amendments or revocations of existing rules, shall be recorded in an appropriate book or books, shall be adequately indexed, shall be kept in the office of the Department, and shall constitute a public record and that the rules shall be printed in pamphlet form and furnished, upon request, to the public free of cost. Effective immediately.
Title
DISEASED ANIMALS-RULE RECORDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 50 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |