IL SB1888 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act. Provides that applicants for a license as a licensed social worker enrolled in an approved program for a master's degree in social work may sit for the authorized examination for licensed social workers in the final semester of the program without prior approval of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Allows the Department to adopt rules to administer the provisions. Requires applicants for a license as a licensed social worker to still meet all requirements for licensure. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
SOCIAL WORKER AUTHORIZED EXAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0568 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 20 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |