IL SB1885 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that there shall be no place of detention or criminal processing established or maintained on the grounds of any school. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-BOOKING STATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Education
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Education
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback