IL SB1884 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Research Dogs and Cats Adoption Act. Provides that a research facility, after the completion of any research involving a dog or cat, shall assess the health of the dog or cat and determine whether it is suitable for adoption. Provides that a research facility shall make reasonable efforts to offer for adoption a dog or cat determined to be suitable. Provides that a research facility that provides dogs or cats to an animal adoption organization is immune from any civil liability under the Act except for willful or wanton misconduct. Requires research facilities to have a research facility adoption policy made available on the facility's website. Defines "research facility".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESEARCH DOGS & CATS ADOPTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 013-000-000
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback