IL SB1882 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that every dog dealer and cattery operator shall provide for every dog or cat available for sale documentation that indicates that the dog or cat has been microchipped. Requires an animal shelter or animal control facility to provide information to an adopter prior to the time of adoption whether the dog or cat to be adopted was microchipped prior to being placed in the animal shelter or animal control facility. Provides that if a dog or cat turned into an animal shelter has a microchip and the primary contact or owner refuses to reclaim the cat or dog, the shelter shall contact the pet shop operator or rescue organization identified on the microchip and request they claim the dog or cat. Provides that a pet shop operator, dog dealer, or cattery operator may not obtain a dog or cat for resale or sell or offer for sale any dog or cat obtained from a person who has committed violations of certain federal laws or regulations, as tracked by the United States Department of Agriculture. Provides for certain exceptions. Requires pet shop operators to microchip all dogs and cats. Requires pet shop operators to include a disclosure that a dog or cat for sale has been microchipped. Denies home rule powers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMAL WELFARE-MICROCHIPPING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. William Davis
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-05-15HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-11HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-05-11HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David Harris
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings
2017-05-05SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 013-000-000
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-03-16SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-001-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-28SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-02-16SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256053.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.15Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.6Amended CodeCitation Text
2256053.8New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback