IL SB1880 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Legislative Reference Bureau Act. Provides that the Legislative Synopsis and Digest shall be published online each week during regular and special sessions of the General Assembly (currently, the form of publication is not specified). Provides that cumulative editions of the Legislative Synopsis and Digest shall be published online and in printed form after the first year, and after adjournment, of each General Assembly. Provides that any person to whom a set number of printed copies is to be provided may receive a lesser number of copies upon request. Provides that any person who receives one or more copies of the printed cumulative edition, whether automatically or by subscription, may, upon request, receive a printed set of the printed interim editions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LRB DIGEST-ONLINE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0239
2017-08-18SenateEffective Date August 18, 2017
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 008-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251355.02Amended CodeCitation Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback