IL SB1877 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-07 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Law Enforcement Officer-Worn Body Camera Act concerning procedures for the use of officer-worn body cameras. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
OFFICER-WORN BODY CAMERA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 706 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 706 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 706 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1877&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1877.htm |