IL SB1874 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that a public utility may apply for expedited review of a certificate of public convenience and necessity for the construction of any new high voltage electric service line that does not exceed 5 miles in length nor advance contiguously to a project filed with the Commission during 2012 (rather than any new high voltage electric service line) and related facilities. Provides that no transmission line may be constructed within 1.5 miles of specified areas. Provides that the amendatory changes shall apply on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act and to all applications filed before the effective date of the amendatory Act for which the Commission has not issued a decision before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-EXPEDITED PROCEDURES
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy; 014-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Energy |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-406.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |