IL SB1872 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Real Estate Brokerage Act from January 1, 2020 to January 1, 2030. Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Adds provisions concerning the temporary practice as a designated managing broker. Makes changes in provisions concerning legislative intent; definitions; applications for managing broker, broker, and leasing agent licenses; requirements for licensure; exemptions from licensure; consideration of prior revocations, conduct, and convictions; examinations; sponsorships; contact information; offices; expiration and renewal of licenses; continuing education requirements; payment of compensation; advertising; agency relationships; recovery from the Real Estate Recovery Fund; and licensing of education provider instructors. Changes references to "leasing agents" to "residential leasing agents" throughout the Act. Provides that, if the party applying for judicial review is not a resident of the State of Illinois, the venue shall be Cook County (rather than Sangamon County). Repeals provisions concerning the Real Estate Audit Fund; surrender of licenses upon revocation or suspension; and advisory letters. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
REG SUNSET-REAL ESTATE LICENSE
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Keith Sommer [R] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0357 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-001 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 024-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 4.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |