IL SB1871 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the term "use as rolling stock moving in interstate commerce" means that a person claiming the exemption must: (1) use the vehicles or trailers to transport persons or property for hire; (2) hold, at the time of purchase, an appropriate credential that authorizes a motor carrier to engage in interstate commerce for-hire; and (3) if the person claiming the exemption is a subsidiary of another company, maintain separate books and records, including separate charts of accounts, and assure that all transactions between the transportation company and the parent are commercially reasonable arms-length transactions. Retains the current definition for aircraft and watercraft. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-ROLLING STOCK
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0321 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-25 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-05-25 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-05-25 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; McGuire |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; McGuire |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 2d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |