IL SB1870 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act and the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Expands the definition of "neglected child" under both Acts to include a child whose umbilical cord tissue contains any amount of a controlled substance as defined in a specified provision of the Illinois Controlled Substances Act or a metabolite thereof. Provides that nothing in the new provisions is intended to limit the type of medically reliable testing that can establish that a controlled substance or metabolite thereof is present in a newborn infant. Further amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 by providing that proof that a newborn infant's umbilical cord tissue contains any amount of a controlled substance as defined under the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, or a metabolite of a controlled substance, constitutes prima facie evidence of abuse or neglect. Amends the Adoption Act. Includes as a ground of unfitness under the definition of "unfit person" a finding that at birth the child's umbilical cord tissue contained any amount of a controlled substance as defined under the Illinois Controlled Substances Act or a metabolite thereof. Provides that nothing in the new provision is intended to limit the type of medically reliable testing that can establish that a controlled substance or metabolite thereof is present in a newborn infant. Effective immediately.
Title
ABUSE-UMBILICAL CORD TISSUE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019 |
2018-11-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-11-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-11-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-11-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-11-20 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |