IL SB1866 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Natural Resources (Conservation) Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources may assess specified consultation fees up to $500 (rather than assess a $500 fee). Deletes language providing that the Department shall not assess any fee for consultations requested by a State agency or federal agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNR-CONSULTATION FEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Environment and Conservation
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20805805-555Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback